MD HB677 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1282
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that candidates for judge of the orphans' court appear on the ballot without party designation.
Title
Orphans' Court Judges - Elections
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB23 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
HB1282 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1282 (Carry Over) 2023-02-24 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 5 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 5 | 706 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 8 | 905 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 9 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0677?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0677f.pdf |