MD HB675 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 676
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a specified coverage requirement that applies to specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations includes coverage for digital tomosynthesis, a radiologic breast cancer screening procedure, under specified circumstances; prohibiting a copayment or coinsurance requirement that is greater than for other breast cancer screenings; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital Tomosynthesis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676
2017-03-30HouseReturned Passed
2017-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2017-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-13SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2017-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {316987/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0675&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0675f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0675t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_676_hb0675t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0675_31698701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0675.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0675_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0675_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0675,h-0366&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0675,s-0921&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback