MD HB675 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Legislative Audits to conduct a performance audit evaluating specified Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission project management practices in Prince George's County; requiring the Office of Legislative Audits, before initiating the audit, to coordinate with the Commission to develop the scope of the audit and submit the scope of the audit to the Joint Audit Committee for approval; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Performance Audit MC/PG 104-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-3) (Y: 137 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 448 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-3) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {220317/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Bi-County Agencies
Clerks of Court
Fees
Inspections
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Prince George's County
Privacy
Program Open Space
Public Works
Real Property
Recordation
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Youth
Auditors and Audits
Bi-County Agencies
Clerks of Court
Fees
Inspections
Legislative Services, Department of
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Prince George's County
Privacy
Program Open Space
Public Works
Real Property
Recordation
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Youth