MD HB675 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of Somerset County to sell at private sale specified properties to the City of Crisfield under any terms the County Commissioners consider appropriate; requiring specified properties to revert to the County Commissioners under specified circumstances; authorizing the County Commissioners to sell specified property to the American Legion - Stanley Cochrane Post #16 at private sale under any terms the County Commissioners consider appropriate; etc.
Title
Somerset County - Private Sale of County Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
County Commissioners
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Somerset County
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
Real Property
Somerset County