MD HB674 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before January 1, 2018, in accordance with specified requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve specified plans, including a specified assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of specified architectural paint after a specified date or 3 months after plan approval; etc.
Title
Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Economic Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Unfair Trade Practices
Auditors and Audits
Commerce and Business
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Liability
Nonprofit Organizations
Privacy
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reports
Retail Sales
Revenue and Taxes
Unfair Trade Practices