MD HB671 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from providing household goods moving services using a certain commercial motor vehicle in the State unless the person is registered as a household goods mover under the Act; requiring a person to submit to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation a certain application and a certain fee to apply for a certain registration; establishing certain requirements and procedures for the registration of household goods movers under the Act; and requiring the Department to adopt certain regulations.
Title
Household Goods Movers Registration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-24) (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (110-24) (Y: 111 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 684 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-24) |
2019-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {613593/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations
Commerce and Business
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Federal Government
Fees
Forms
Interstate Affairs
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Registration
Rules and Regulations