MD HB671 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-8)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-07 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for up to $250 of the unreimbursed expenses paid or incurred by an eligible teacher during a taxable year for the purchase of classroom supplies if the supplies are used by students in the classroom or the eligible teacher to prepare for classroom teaching; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Classroom Supplies Purchased by Teachers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {839934/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2018-03-28SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {445760/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0671&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0671f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0671t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0671e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0671_44576001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0671_83993401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0671.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0671_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0549.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0671_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1329.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1218.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback