MD HB671 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Howard County, after consultation with the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners, to adopt ordinances or regulations relating to verification, inspection, and display of specified licenses issued under specified provisions of law; and requiring the governing body of Howard County to provide that the Howard County Health Officer and the Howard County Police Department have specified authority to carry out specified provisions of ordinances or regulations.
Title
Howard County - Practice of Massage - Regulation Ho. Co. 13-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {256486/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Health Occupations
Howard County
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations
Health Occupations
Howard County
Inspections
Law Enforcement
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Public Officials
Rules and Regulations