MD HB67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain criminal penalties for a violation of certain prohibitions against selling or installing a certain plumbing-related fixture or other device that is not water-conserving.
Title
Maryland Plumbing Act - Non-Water-Conserving Fixtures and Devices - Repeal of Criminal Penalties for Sale or Installation
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 343 |
2018-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-01-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-01-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-01-22 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-07-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Conservation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Plumbing
Water
Conservation
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Penalties and Sentences
Plumbing
Water