MD HB669 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-20 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each governing board of a public institution of higher education in the State to develop a specified policy for the waiver of specified tuition for employees of the Maryland Higher Education Commission and their children.
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Employees and Children - Tuition Waiver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-20 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-21 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Higher Education Commission
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Higher Education Commission
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Tuition
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0669.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0669f.pdf |