MD HB666 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalty, for a second or subsequent offense, for a person who fails to comply with the relief granted in an interim, a temporary, or a final peace order.
Title
Courts - Peace Orders - Penalties
Sponsors
Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Rudolph Cane [D] | Del. Norman Conway [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] |
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (35-11) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |