MD HB665 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-30 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Baltimore City Department of Public Works to establish a rebate program to assist customers with charges for increased water usage due to certain activities undertaken to prevent pipes from freezing on designated Code Blue days; and requiring, if the Department establishes a certain rebate program, that participation be at the option of the customer and rebates be provided on a per diem basis.
Title
Baltimore City – Department of Public Works – Frozen–Pipe Prevention Rebate Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |