MD HB665 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence; specifying the membership, cochairs, staff, and purpose of the Commission; requiring the Commission to conduct an overview of laws, develop plans and policies, make recommendations, and carry out duties regarding cybersecurity and innovation; requiring the Commission to submit an interim report, including recommended legislation, to the Governor and the General Assembly by January 1, 2012, and a final report by September 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Commission on Maryland Cybersecurity Innovation and Excellence
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] |
Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Del. William Frick [D] | Del. Ronald George [R] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 108 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (108-29) | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-02-14 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
Privacy
Reports
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications
Committees and Commissions
Computers
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Government
Information Technology, Department of
Privacy
Reports
Safety
State Universities and Colleges
Sunset
Telecommunications