MD HB664 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; and providing specified exceptions.
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 33 |
2017-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {486384/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Flags
General Services, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation, Department of
Flags
General Services, Department of
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Transportation, Department of