MD HB664 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Removing Frederick County from the list of counties required to grant specified property tax setoffs to municipal corporations; requiring the governing body of Frederick County to annually meet and discuss with the governing body of each municipal corporation in the county the county property tax rate to be set for assessments of property; requiring, if the county and the municipal corporation fail to reach an agreement, the county to grant a tax setoff in accordance with the formula used in the preceding taxable year; etc.
Title
Frederick County Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Frederick Municipalities)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {895160/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Community Facilities and Services
Frederick County
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local
Community Facilities and Services
Frederick County
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Taxes - Property - Local