MD HB663 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring institutions of higher education to develop and implement an academic forgiveness policy on or before August 1, 2018, that applies to applicants who earned unsatisfactory or failing grades at a prior institution of higher education under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education – Academic Forgiveness Policy – Established

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2018-02-13HouseHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-31HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback