MD HB663 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing a crime of violence when the person knows or reasonably should know that a minor is present; establishing circumstances under which a minor is present in a residence; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; establishing that a sentence under the Act is separate from and consecutive to a sentence for any crime based on the act establishing a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |