MD HB661 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a law enforcement officer to use a specified firearm camera, a device attached to a firearm that is capable of recording video and intercepting oral communications, to intercept a specified oral communication under specified circumstances.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Firearm Cameras
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Judiciary |