MD HB660 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Defining the terms "service dog", "support dog", and "therapy horse" for the purposes of the law governing the Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program in the Department of Veterans Affairs; defining "service dog" as one that is individually trained to perform certain tasks for the benefit of individuals with certain disabilities; defining "support dog" as one that is individually trained to provide certain support services; and defining "therapy horse" to include one that is deemed appropriate for interactions with veterans.
Title
Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {284438/1 Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB284 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Subjects
Animals
Disabilities
Dogs
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Disabilities
Dogs
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Veterans Affairs, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 957 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |