MD HB66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program, which authorizes the Board of Public Works, on the recommendation of the Executive Director of the Governor's Office for Children, to make specified grants to counties, municipal corporations, and nonprofit organizations; repealing provisions of law relating to the purposes, administration, and funding of the Program; repealing provisions of law relating to the uses, terms, and conditions of the grants and the State's recovery of funds expended under the Program; etc.
Title
Residential Child Care Capital Grant Program - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 3:30 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-26 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-09-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Attorneys' Fees
Child Care
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Construction
Counties
Court Costs
Equipment
Grants
Judgments
Land Records
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Child Care
Children
Children, Governor's Office for
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Construction
Counties
Court Costs
Equipment
Grants
Judgments
Land Records
Liens
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Notices
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Religion
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment