MD HB659 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland to examine the tax sale system to maximize resources, facilitate properties getting to productive use, and protect residents; requiring the Task Force to evaluate the impact of tax sales, how tax sales are conducted in each county, and tax sales to collect delinquent water charges and alternative methods of collecting delinquent water charges; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Tax Sales in Maryland
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 615 |
2017-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-04-08 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {379035/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {305365/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2017-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Consumer Protection
Counties
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Urban Renewal
Vagrancy
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Consumer Protection
Counties
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Taxes - Property
Urban Renewal
Vagrancy