MD HB657 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing specified pharmacists to administer a self-administered drug to a patient under specified circumstances in accordance with specified regulations; defining a specified term; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Scope of Practice - Administration of Drugs
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 447 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816684/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Health Occupations
Immunization
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Drugs
Health Occupations
Immunization
Nurses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Rules and Regulations