MD HB655 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an election of a county commissioner or members of certain county boards of education to represent a specific district to be decided by a plurality of the votes cast within that district; and applying certain provisions of the Act only to code counties and commission counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Elections - County Commissioner and County Boards of Education - District Voting

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 453627/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 903624/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (Y: 41 N: 86 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 593626/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 86 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 653524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 39 N: 87 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Floor Amendment 773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (Y: 42 N: 87 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-02-25 - House - Floor Amendment 603420/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (Y: 45 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-03-03HouseThird Reading Passed (95-39)
2021-03-03HouseMotion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
2021-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {453627/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-91)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {903624/1 (Delegate Arentz) Rejected (41-86)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {593626/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (42-86)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {653524/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (39-87)
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {783724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
2021-02-26HouseFloor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel) Rejected (42-87)
2021-02-25HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
2021-02-25HouseFloor Amendment {773922/1 (Delegate Beitzel)
2021-02-25HouseFloor Amendment {603420/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (45-93)
2021-02-25HouseFloor Amendment {433226/1 (Delegate Morgan) Withdrawn
2021-02-23HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
2021-02-23HouseFloor Amendment {223724/1 (Delegate Wilkins) Adopted
2021-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {795968/1 Adopted
2021-02-22HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-01-28HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-28HouseHearing canceled
2021-01-23HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-22HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education310A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Education31101(n/a)See Bill Text
Education3114(n/a)See Bill Text
Education3301(n/a)See Bill Text
Education34A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Education3601(n/a)See Bill Text
Education3901(n/a)See Bill Text
Local Government9114(n/a)See Bill Text
Garrett County30.02(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County261A(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County261B(n/a)See Bill Text
St. Mary's County261C(n/a)See Bill Text
Calvert County2102(n/a)See Bill Text
Charles County271A(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0655?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0655f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0655t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_79596801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_22372401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_43322601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_60342001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_77392201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_45362701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_78372401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_65352401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_59362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0655_90362401.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0199.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0233.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0234.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0235.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0236.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0237.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0255.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback