MD HB655 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a person applying for a certain residential rental license to certify that the dwelling unit is not more than 60 days in arrears for a common ownership community fee; and providing that the Act does not preclude a county or municipality from adopting or enforcing requirements that are more stringent than the requirements of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Residential Rental Licensing - Common Ownership Community Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (134-4)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {730811/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback