MD HB655 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to develop and make available a certain form; requiring certain biosafety level 3 (BSL-3) laboratories to report, on or before September 30 each year, certain information to the Department; requiring the Department to report, on or before December 31 each year, certain information regarding the number and location of the laboratories to the Maryland Emergency Management Agency and certain local officials, and the total number of the laboratories to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Department of Health - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - House - House Floor - Sustained (0-140) (Y: 1 N: 141 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading Finance
2018-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback