MD HB655 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt deer on private property in Harford County with a bow and arrow or crossbow during open season at specified times subject to specified provisions of law.
Title
Harford County - Sunday Hunting - Deer Bow Hunting Season
Sponsors
Del. Glen Glass [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-9) (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-9) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {540014/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |