MD HB653 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-9)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 215
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that certain patients be advised of the benefits and risks associated with the prescription of certain opioids and benzodiazepines under certain circumstances; and providing that a violation of the Act is grounds for disciplinary action by the health occupations board that regulates the health care provider who commits the violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Providers - Opioid and Benzodiazepine Prescriptions - Discussion of Benefits and Risks

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-6) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 215
2018-04-10HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-09SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-09SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-04-05SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (131-6)
2018-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {516289/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-21HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseHearing canceled
2018-02-20HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback