MD HB653 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-29 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a cash balance plan under the State Retirement and Pension System; requiring that individuals who on June 30, 2012, are members of specified pension systems become members of the cash balance plan on July 1, 2012; requiring that specified individuals who are employed on or after July 1, 2012, become members of the cash balance plan; requiring the Board of Trustees of the State Retirement and Pension System to administer the cash balance plan; making provisions of the Act subject to a contingency; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension Systems - Cash Balance Plan
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Federal Government
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Teachers
Appropriations
Federal Government
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
Rules and Regulations
State Employees
Teachers
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0653.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0653f.pdf |