MD HB652 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a commissioner appointed from Montgomery County to be appointed for a maximum of three consecutive full terms as a member of the Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission if the commissioner is designated as chair of the Montgomery County Planning board during the commissioner's second term in office; and providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Montgomery County - Commissioner Terms MC/PG 105-15
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-3) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 446 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-3) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {310217/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-12 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
County Commissioners
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County
County Commissioners
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission
Montgomery County