MD HB648 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the authority and responsibilities of the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA); altering a certain explanation of purpose for certain provisions of law; stating the policy of the State with regard to certain emergency management activities and operations; requiring MEMA to prepare for certain emergency management activities and operations; providing for the circumstances under which MEMA may assume authority for responding to an emergency; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Emergency Management Agency - Definitions and Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateReferred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (130-0)
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {676782/1 Adopted
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-30HouseHearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Safety14101(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14101.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14102(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14103(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Safety14801(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback