MD HB646 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to appropriate $900,000 to the Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland from the Cigarette Restitution Fund in fiscal year 2024 and each fiscal year thereafter; and requiring the funds appropriated under the Act to be used for the purpose of funding the activities of the Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission.
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Funding for Southern Maryland Agricultural Development Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments {603328/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-25 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB378 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Subjects
Agriculture
Appropriations
Budgets
Cigarettes
Economic Development
Governor
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tri-County Council
Appropriations
Budgets
Cigarettes
Economic Development
Governor
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Tri-County Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 13 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 13 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 118 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 317 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |