MD HB646 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to charge a certain additional fee on the issuance of special registration plates for recipients of an individually earned, combat-related armed forces medal that results in a surplus of at least $10 for each issuance of new registration plates; requiring that the additional fee be credited to the Maryland Veterans Trust Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Registration - Special Plates for Veterans - Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 286
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Ready) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateMotion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ready) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-12SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2020-03-11HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2020-03-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-30HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-29HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Government9913(n/a)See Bill Text
Transportation13619.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback