MD HB643 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Rosapepe)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that, for each of fiscal years 2020 through 2024, a certain amount of video lottery terminal proceeds distributed to the Racetrack Facility Renewal Account for certain racing licensees be allocated in a certain manner to the racecourse at Timonium for racetrack facility capital construction and improvements; repealing a provision of law that authorizes the holder of a racing license to race at the racecourse at Timonium to use a certain amount of money to support a certain number of racing days; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Racetrack Facility Renewal Account - Racecourse at Timonium

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateRecommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Rosapepe)
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {419233/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-20SenateHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {265566/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback