MD HB640 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Making certain provisions of law relating to the filing, issuance, and modification of certain peace orders and to the shielding of certain court records of certain peace order proceedings apply to certain peace orders filed by certain employers on the basis of certain acts committed against certain employees under certain circumstances; providing certain immunity from certain liability to a certain employer under certain circumstances; prohibiting an employer from retaliating against an employee under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {592816/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback