MD HB64 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a requirement for designating a beneficiary of a member, former member, or retiree of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing an option for a member, former member, or retiree to designate a beneficiary through the State Retirement Agency's secure access participant portal with an electronic signature; altering the definition of "designated beneficiary"; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designation of Beneficiary
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 8:30 p.m. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-02-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-11 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Death
Electronic Communication
internet
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Cybersecurity
Death
Electronic Communication
internet
Minors
Notices
Privacy
Reports
Retirement Systems
Revenue and Taxes
Signatures
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology