MD HB631 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-10 - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain goals and programs related to land conservation; establishing the Local Land Trust Revolving Loan Program to provide loans to certain land trusts to purchase land for conservation purposes; establishing the Land Preservation Rapid Response Advisory Committee to review loan applications and make recommendations on which projects to fund; establishing the Local Land Trust Revolving Loan Fund; establishing the 40 x 40 Land Conservation Implementation Grant Program to support land conservation goals; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {883920/1 Adopted |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-7) |
2023-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {573321/1 Adopted |
2023-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2023-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB470 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Subjects
Agriculture
Air Pollution
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Easements
Education
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Fish and Fishing
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Grants
internet
Land Preservation Trusts
Loans
Low-Income
Minorities
Minors
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Pollution
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Smart Growth
Time
Youth
Air Pollution
Appropriations
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Easements
Education
Environmental Matters
Environmental Trust
Fish and Fishing
Foresters
Forests and Parks
Governor
Grants
internet
Land Preservation Trusts
Loans
Low-Income
Minorities
Minors
Natural Resources - Generally
Nonprofit Organizations
Pollution
Poverty
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Smart Growth
Time
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 215 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 216 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 13 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |