MD HB631 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 80-9-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a manufacturer or wholesale distributor from engaging in price gouging in the sale of an essential off-patent or generic drug; establishing that it is not a violation of a specified provision of the Act for a wholesale distributor to increase a price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; authorizing the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to notify the Attorney General of an increase in the price of an essential off-patent or generic drug under specified circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Essential Off-Patent or Generic Drugs - Price Gouging - Prohibition

Sponsors

Del. The Speaker [?]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D]
Del. Charles Barkley [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Del. Darryl Barnes [D]Del. Erek Barron [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Pamela Beidle [D]Del. Benjamin Brooks [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Del. Mark Chang [D]Del. Luke Clippinger [D]Del. Frank Conaway [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]
Del. Dereck Davis [D]Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Eric Ebersole [D]Del. Diana Fennell [D]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. William Frick [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. Tawanna Gaines [D]
Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]Del. Antonio Hayes [D]
Del. Keith Haynes [D]Del. Anne Healey [D]Del. Shelly Hettleman [D]Del. Terri Hill [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Marvin Holmes [D]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Michael Jackson [D]
Del. Jay Jalisi [D]Del. Sally Jameson [D]Del. Adrienne Jones [D]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]
Del. Tony Knotts [D]Del. Carol Krimm [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]Del. Clarence Lam [D]
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D]Del. Brooke Lierman [D]Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D]Del. Eric Luedtke [D]
Del. Cory McCray [D]Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. David Moon [D]
Del. Marice Morales [D]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]Del. Edith Patterson [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]
Del. Andrew Platt [D]Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D]Del. Pamela Queen [D]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]
Del. Shane Robinson [D]Del. Samuel Rosenberg [D]Del. Sheree Sample-Hughes [D]Del. Carlos Sanchez [D]
Del. Theodore Sophocleus [D]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Charles Sydnor [D]Del. James Tarlau [D]
Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Del. Joseph Vallario [D]Del. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Del. Jay Walker [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. Mary Washington [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]
Del. Karen Young [D]Del. Pat Young [D]Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Angela Angel [D]
Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]Del. Patrick McDonough [R]Del. Ric Metzgar [R]Del. Christian Miele [R]
Del. Sid Saab [R]Del. Chris West [R]Del. Susan Aumann [R]Del. Ned Carey [D]
Del. Johnny Mautz [R]Del. Seth Howard [R]

Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-7) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 14 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32) (Y: 13 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-4) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 818
2017-04-10HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (137-2)
2017-04-10HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (38-7)
2017-04-07SenateFloor Amendment {893327/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-31)
2017-04-07SenateFloor Amendment {683326/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (13-32)
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-06SenateFloor Amendment {943322/2 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2017-04-05SenateSpecial Order until 4/6 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {247274/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2017-03-23SenateHearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-21SenateFirst Reading Finance
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (137-4)
2017-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {376789/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations and Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0631&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0631f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0631t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0631e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_818_hb0631e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0631_37678901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0631_24727401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0631_94332202.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0631_68332601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0631_89332701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0631.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0631_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0631_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0631,h-0847&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0631,s-1253&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0631,s-1254&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0631,s-1255&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0631,h-1422&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback