MD HB631 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which Howard County deputy sheriffs are eligible for a compensable permanent partial disability of less than 75 weeks; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability - Howard County Deputy Sheriffs Ho. Co. 11-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-9) (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493 |
2016-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2016-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-29 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |