MD HB626 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1269
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $7,000 to $10,000, the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for an individual who is a qualifying public safety volunteer for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024; requiring each police agency to maintain certain records of the activities of each member of a police auxiliary or reserve, provide each member with a certain report on the preceding calendar year, and provide a certain report and certification that an individual qualified for the subtraction modification; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Public Safety Volunteers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB323 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-13 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
HB1269 (Carry Over) 2023-02-20 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1269 (Carry Over) 2023-02-20 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Armed Forces
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Volunteers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Police Training and Standards Commission
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Volunteers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 208 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0626?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0626f.pdf |