MD HB626 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-20 - Referred Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Human-Relevant Research Fund under the administration of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to provide grants and loans to promote State-funded research intended to develop human-relevant alternatives to using nonhuman animals in medical and product testing and research; requiring, beginning January 15, 2024, research facilities that engage in animal testing or research to pay a contribution, based on a certain number of animals, to the Secretary of Health; providing a civil penalty for a violation of the Act; etc.
Title
Animal Testing and Research - Human-Relevant Research Funding and Animal Testing and Research Contributions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-36) |
2023-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783528/1 Adopted |
2023-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2023-02-13 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2023-02-03 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB560 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-22 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Subjects
Animals
Appropriations
Business Regulation
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Ethics
Fees
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Medical Research
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Appropriations
Business Regulation
Chemical Tests
Commerce and Business
Contracts
Corporations
Ethics
Fees
Governor
Grants
Health, Department of
Industry and Technology
Licenses
Medical Research
Public Health
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 429 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10-4D | 6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 2203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 2204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 2205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 171 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |