MD HB623 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Calvert County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $10,320,000 to finance the construction, improvement, or development of certain public buildings, roads, and facilities in Calvert County, as herein defined, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds in like par amount; etc.
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96 |
2019-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Calvert County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Fire Protection
Highways
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Rescue Squads
Water
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Fire Protection
Highways
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Rescue Squads
Water