MD HB621 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB670
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reducing the annual fee for a stadium beer, wine, and liquor license in Harford County from $10,000 to $7,000.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Stadium License Annual Fee
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583024/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {413225/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
HB670 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Harford County
Retail Sales
Stadiums
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Fees
Harford County
Retail Sales
Stadiums
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 22 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |