MD HB621 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the manner by which the Comptroller withholds from certain income tax distributions certain amounts that a local government owes to the Local Reserve Account for its share of certain income tax refunds and interest that are paid from the Account related to a certain decision of the U.S. Supreme Court.
Title
County Tax Fairness Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 632 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Comptroller
Counties
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Income Tax
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Income
Counties
Counties - Generally
Federal Government
Income Tax
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2016 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |