MD HB620 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 278
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Executive Director of the Maryland Aviation Administration to work with House of Ruth Maryland to install secure donation boxes at the entrance to each security screening checkpoint at the Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport; and requiring that money deposited in the donation boxes be used only to support House of Ruth Maryland.
Title
Baltimore-Washington International Thurgood Marshall Airport - Security Screening Checkpoint - Charitable Donations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 278 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {630414/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Airports
Boundaries
Equipment
Gifts
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Generally
Airports
Boundaries
Equipment
Gifts
Nonprofit Organizations
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Generally
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 5 | 413.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |