MD HB62 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application and issuance requirements and procedures for specified fishing and hunting licenses and registrations; repealing the reimbursement standards and procedures applicable to agents of the Department of Natural Resources who have unsold angler's or hunting licenses; repealing the prohibition against issuing a hunting license without specified written consent to an applicant under the age of 16 years; requiring a hunter of migratory game birds to be in possession of proof of purchase of the Maryland Migratory Game Bird Stamp; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-01-27 | House | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2015-10-05 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Identification
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Identification
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Reimbursement Rates
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations