MD HB617 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to grant a property tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on the dwelling of a certain surviving spouse of a fallen service member who died while on active duty from injury or disease which was incurred in the line of duty.
Title
Property Tax – Credit for Surviving Spouses of Fallen Service Members
Sponsors
Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] | Del. Seth Howard [R] | Del. Jay Jalisi [D] | Del. Steve Johnson [D] |
Del. Teresa Reilly [R] | Del. Sid Saab [R] | Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {993225/1 Adopted |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-19 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2022-02-02 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Counties
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Counties
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Residential Property
Spouses
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 267 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |