MD HB617 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 795
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 795
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that units of local government with planning and zoning authority may adopt specified forest conservation thresholds and afforestation and reforestation requirements as part of its local forest conservation program that are more stringent than specified forest conservation thresholds and reforestation requirements in State law.
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Conservation Act - Forest Conservation Thresholds and Afforestation and Reforestation Requirements
Sponsors
Del. Anne Healey [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D] |
Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. James Gilchrist [D] | Del. Stephen Lafferty [D] | Del. Shane Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-4) (Y: 132 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 795 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-4) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {330914/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Conservation
Counties
Forests and Parks
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources - Generally
Rules and Regulations
Counties
Forests and Parks
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources - Generally
Rules and Regulations