MD HB613 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a pharmacist who meets the requirements of State Board of Pharmacy regulations to prescribe and dispense specified contraceptives; requiring the State Board of Pharmacy, on or before September 1, 2018, and in consultation with the State Board of Physicians, the State Board of Nursing, and specified stakeholders to adopt regulations establishing the conditions under which pharmacists may prescribe and dispense contraceptives; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacists - Contraceptives - Prescribing and Dispensing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (111-24) (Y: 111 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-14) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-14) (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 820
2017-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (111-24)
2017-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (33-14)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments {784931/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (125-14)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {656882/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-10HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0613&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0613f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0613t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb0613e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_820_hb0613e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0613_65688201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0613_78493101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0613.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0613_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb0613_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0613,h-0813&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0613,s-1133&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0613,h-1388&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback