MD HB606 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Juvenile Justice Reform Council; requiring the Council, using a data-driven approach, to develop a statewide framework of policies to invest in strategies to increase public safety and reduce recidivism of youth offenders; requiring the Council to submit an interim report by December 1, 2019, and a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice Reform Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 253
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateFloor Amendment {873424/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {208578/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-21SenateHearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {232710/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0606&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0606f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0606t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0606e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_253_hb0606e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0606_23271001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0606_20857801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0606_87342401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0606.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0606_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0520.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0606_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1303.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1592.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback