MD HB605 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority to engage an outside consultant to conduct a market-specific study to make certain determinations related to a State student loan refinancing program in Maryland; requiring the consultant to report to the Authority and requiring the report to include certain elements; requiring the Authority to review the consultant's report and make certain comments or recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly; terminating the Act after June 30, 2020; etc.
Title
State Student Loan Refinancing Program - Market-Specific Consultant Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-8) (Y: 130 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-2) (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 124 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 620 |
2018-04-03 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-8) |
2018-04-03 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-2) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee Amendment {417573/1 Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reassigned to Finance |
2018-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-14) |
2018-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-26 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Health
Higher Education
Loans
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Health
Higher Education
Loans
Reports
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset